Trustees ASHMORE PARK COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 1061701
Charity reporting is overdue by 1153 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
James Douglas Clarke | Chair | 13 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
Jordan Peter Clarke | Trustee | 12 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
David John Griffiths | Trustee | 14 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Christine Phillips | Trustee | 28 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Melvyn Phillips | Trustee | 23 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Lindsey Marie Williams | Trustee | 23 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Levy | Trustee | 15 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Susan Ward | Trustee | 13 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
IRENE MARSH | Trustee | 13 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
Vivien Matthews | Trustee | 13 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
ANGELA HALL | Trustee | 30 November 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.