Trustees GIRLS' EDUCATION COMPANY LTD
Charity number: 310638
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KHAN EMIR FEISAL FCMA. JP | Trustee | 18 March 2023 |
|
|||||
Dame Juliet May | Trustee | 18 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Judd | Trustee | 18 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Griffiths | Trustee | 09 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jenny Fannin-Lovell | Trustee | 06 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Vivek Ganotra | Trustee | 20 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nicole Hughes | Trustee | 22 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Elizabeth Owen Gibbon | Trustee | 25 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Peter John Curtis Warren | Trustee | 24 September 2019 |
|
|||||
Dr MARGARET JANE MACDOUGALL | Trustee | 09 June 2017 |
|
|||||
Dr Caro Godlee | Trustee | 04 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
PATRICK LEWIS | Trustee | 17 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD WINTER CBE | Trustee | 21 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
Dr LOUISE L'ESTRANGE FAWCETT MA DPHIL | Trustee | 21 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
Diana Rose | Trustee |
|
||||||
Rt Revd ALAN WILSON | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.