KING EDWARD VI'S SCHOOL AT CHELMSFORD

Charity number: 310861
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £30.67k £55.92k £31.51k £32.74k £32.89k
Total expenditure £5.59k £100.07k £32.81k £55.88k £54.85k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A