Trustees SIR ANTONY BROWNE'S SCHOOL TRUST, BRENTWOOD
Charity number: 310864

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SIR MICHAEL JOHN SNYDER | Chair |
|
||||||||
Philip Machray | Trustee | 17 June 2023 |
|
|||||||
Dr Mark Fenton | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|||||||
Jason Fergus | Trustee | 13 March 2021 |
|
|||||||
MATTHEW HAMPSON | Trustee | 14 March 2020 |
|
|||||||
Scott Norris | Trustee | 24 November 2018 |
|
|||||||
Jasmin Bryan | Trustee | 17 March 2018 |
|
|||||||
John Griffith-Jones | Trustee | 17 March 2018 |
|
|||||||
Susan Dalgarno | Trustee | 25 November 2017 |
|
|||||||
AMANDA HARDY KC | Trustee | 26 November 2016 |
|
|||||||
Lord Black of Brentwood | Trustee | 26 November 2013 |
|
|||||||
DR CRISTOPHER TOUT | Trustee | 25 April 2013 |
|
|||||||
JAMES RICHARD TUMBRIDGE LLB | Trustee | 25 April 2013 |
|
|
||||||
PROFESSOR BRUCE JOHN WILLIAM EVANS BSC PHD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
THE VEN D W LOWMAN, THE ARCHDEACON OF SOUTHEND | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
MR BOB MCLINTOCK MSC DMS DIPED | Trustee |
|
||||||||
PAUL BERESFORD FNAEA | Trustee |
|
||||||||
DAVID ELMS | Trustee |
|
||||||||
JENNY JONES | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.