Financial history HENRY GREEN SCHOLARSHIPS IN CONNECTION WITH COUNCIL SCHOOLS

Charity number: 310918
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £3.78k £4.47k £4.71k £5.53k £4.39k
Total expenditure £6.95k £10.00k £9.01k £5.50k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A