Trustees HOCKERILL EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Charity number: 311018
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Archdeacon Janet Mackenzie | Chair | 31 December 2018 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||
Carrie Prior | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||
Rt Rev Dr Gulnar Eleanor Francis-Dehqani | Trustee | 30 November 2022 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||
David Roy Lodge | Trustee | 30 November 2022 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||
Judy Ann King | Trustee | 30 November 2021 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||
DAVID JOHN MORTON | Trustee | 05 December 2016 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||
The Ven Robin Lucas Colin King | Trustee | 11 November 2015 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||
Anthea Jane Kenna | Trustee | 13 May 2015 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||
COLIN GRAHAM BIRD FCA | Trustee |
|
||||||||||||||||||||
MRS H POTTER | Trustee |
|
||||||||||||||||||||
JANET ROSEMARY SCOTT | Trustee |
|
||||||||||||||||||||
RT REVD DR ALAN GREGORY CLAYTON SMITH BA MA PHD | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.