LOCKERS PARK SCHOOL TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 311061
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019
Total gross income £2.37m £2.35m £2.87m £2.80m £3.08m
Total expenditure £2.29m £2.44m £2.55m £2.88m £2.74m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £13.12k £7.99k £327.76k £0 £255.00k
Income - Other trading activities £28.92k £42.19k £34.98k £33.38k £34.93k
Income - Charitable activities £2.32m £2.30m £2.51m £2.77m £2.79m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £2.29k £1.76k £155 £2.02k £4.82k
Income - Other £11.00k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.25m £2.40m £2.51m £2.83m £2.69m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £36.34k £37.48k £57.59k £51.25k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0