Governing document THE ARCHITECTURAL ASSOCIATION (INCORPORATED)
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION DATED 1920 AS AMENDED 16 AUGUST 1963, 7 DECEMBER 2009, 17 JANUARY 2011, AND 25 JANUARY 2016 AND 27 JULY 2017
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PROMOTE AND AFFORD FACILITIES FOR THE STUDY OF ARCHITECTURE BY THE CARRYING ON OF A SCHOOL OF ARCHITECTURE; THE FOUNDING OF SCHOLARSHIPS AND GIVING OF PRIZES BY THE PROVISION OF LECTURES AND CLASSES AND SUCH OTHER METHODS CONSISTENT WITH THE PRIMARY OBJECT OF THE CHARITY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.