Accounts and annual returns THE WILLIAMS CHURCH MUSIC TRUST

Charity number: 311088
Charity reporting is up to date (51 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2021 28 March 2022 51 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 28 March 2022 51 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 29 July 2021 174 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 29 July 2021 174 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2019 05 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 05 February 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2018 23 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 23 November 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2017 24 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 24 November 2017 On time Download Open in new window