BARTHOLOMEW BALDERSTON'S FOUNDATION

Charity number: 311251
Charity reporting is overdue by 1766 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2007 31/03/2008 31/03/2009 31/03/2010 31/03/2011
Total gross income £92 £80 £158 £163 £168
Total expenditure £417 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A