Accounts and annual returns THE COTTON HALL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 311356
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 07 March 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 13 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 21 October 2020 113 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 15 October 2019 107 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 06 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 06 June 2018 On time Download Open in new window