Financial history THE COTTON HALL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 311356
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £26.18k £24.91k £23.56k £20.98k £24.34k
Total expenditure £20.78k £32.81k £20.86k £16.28k £15.71k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £6.14k