Trustees THE COTTON HALL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 311356
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Spencer Norman Trustee 13 October 2020
None on record
Rev Michael David Bigg Trustee 13 September 2020
GIRTON CHURCH CHARITY
Received: On time
THE PCC OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST ANDREW'S, GIRTON IN THE DIOCESE OF ELY
Received: On time
Laura Norman Trustee 15 December 2018
None on record
Ian Jones Trustee 15 October 2016
None on record
BRUCE HUNTER Trustee 13 May 2013
None on record
Margaret Pearce Higgins Trustee 15 December 2012
CARE NETWORK CAMBRIDGESHIRE
Received: On time
ALICE MARJORIE FEW Trustee
GIRTON CHURCH CHARITY
Received: On time