Accounts and annual returns Minsterworth Free School Foundation

Charity number: 311648
Charity reporting is overdue by 229 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 229 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 229 days
Annual return 31 December 2021 04 October 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 04 October 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 23 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 17 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 17 February 2020 109 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required