Financial history ST ANDREW'S METHODIST EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 311665
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £245 £284 £77 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £128 £0 £68 £150
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A