Dogfen lywodraethu TOCKINGTON MANOR SCHOOL LIMITED
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 23 DEC 1966 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09 MAR 1988 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17 MAR 1994 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13 MAR 1995 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 02 FEB 2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 18 JUN 2021
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF CHILDREN BY THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A SCHOOL OR SCHOOLS AND NURSERY OR NURSERIES IN SOUTH GLOUCESTERSHIRE OR ELSEWHERE AND BY ANCILLARY OR INCIDENTAL EDUCATIONAL ACTIVITIES AND OTHER ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.