Financial history Thomas Deacon Foundation

Charity number: 311852
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £7.82k £6.64k £6.65k £2.96k £3.63k
Total expenditure £3.38k £3.29k £6.24k £6.67k £4.66k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A