THE LONDON ORPHAN ASYLUM (REED'S SCHOOL)

Charity number: 312008
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

19 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Carolynn Davies-Shatz Trustee 15 November 2019 None on record
Keri Lane Trustee 08 November 2019 None on record
Ravi Mohindra Trustee 01 September 2019 None on record
Mandy Donald Trustee 01 September 2016 None on record
David Laws Trustee 01 September 2020 None on record
JOHN SIMPSON Trustee 01 September 2016 None on record
Michiel Soeting Trustee 01 January 2021 None on record
Peter Madden Trustee 01 September 2020 None on record
Chris Taylor Trustee 01 January 2021
LORD MARSHALL'S SETTLEMENT Received: On time
Diana Mary Peacock Trustee 01 September 2015 None on record
Lucinda Napier FSI Trustee
THE CAZENOVE CHARITABLE TRUST Received: On time
Dr Alison McLean Trustee 13 June 2013 None on record
Nigel Taunt Trustee 01 September 2014 None on record
James Fulton Trustee 01 September 2016 None on record
Martin Robinson Trustee 13 June 2013 None on record
KAREN RICHARDSON Trustee None on record
Jo Denham Trustee 15 November 2019 None on record
Steven Poole Trustee 21 November 2013 None on record
Marcus Baker Trustee 01 September 2018 None on record