THE SAINT JOHN'S SCHOOL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 312064
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 28 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 28 April 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2019 02 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 02 April 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2018 30 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 30 April 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2017 11 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 11 April 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2016 11 April 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 11 April 2017 On time Download