Financial history HALLIFORD SCHOOL LIMITED

Charity number: 312090
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £6.23m £6.45m £6.98m £7.28m £8.14m
Total expenditure £6.19m £5.92m £6.21m £6.70m £7.25m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £115.98k £40.07k
Income - Donations and legacies £950 £29.64k £20.89k £8.49k £4.41k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £6.23m £6.42m £6.95m £7.26m £8.14m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.77k £3.45k £9.42k £8.72k £444
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £6.19m £5.92m £6.21m £6.70m £7.25m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £83.82k £0 £18.07k £19.53k £17.61k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0