WALTER WALLINGER'S CHARITY

Charity number: 312137
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £2.28k £2.36k £2.47k £1.48k £2.44k
Total expenditure £1.93k £330 £2.32k £1.95k £2.14k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A