WHITECHAPEL GALLERY

Charity number: 312162
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £3.94m £4.16m £4.30m £4.49m £4.24m
Total expenditure £4.69m £4.58m £4.46m £4.91m £4.76m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £1.51m £1.55m £53.30k
Income - Donations and legacies £4.32m £2.81m £2.93m £3.13m £3.16m
Income - Other trading activities £708.98k £654.26k £623.51k £656.87k £524.21k
Income - Charitable activities £454.78k £616.21k £691.70k £646.56k £510.66k
Income - Endowments £1.55m £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.09k £82.82k £53.23k £65.60k £47.33k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.58m £3.48m £3.36m £3.70m £3.64m
Expenditure - Raising funds £588.00k £631.27k £1.09m £726.54k £689.42k
Expenditure - Governance £23.19k £25.77k £23.01k £15.30k £21.38k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £22.37k £17.73k £16.80k £45.56k £41.81k
Expenditure - Other £518.26k £462.85k £0 £489.03k £428.60k