NEED AND TAYLORS EDUCATIONAL CHARITY

Charity number: 312269
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £14.09k £13.57k £14.55k £14.18k £14.82k
Total expenditure £1.50k £240 £0 £0 £9.70k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A