BRITISH AND FOREIGN SCHOOL SOCIETY TRUST

Charity number: 312516
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Anood Al-Samerai Trustee 14 May 2021
THE BRITISH AND FOREIGN SCHOOL SOCIETY Received: On time
ANTI-SLAVERY INTERNATIONAL Received: On time
Leslie Stephen Trustee 18 May 2018 None on record
PROFESSOR JOY PALMER COOPER Trustee 18 May 2018
THE BRITISH AND FOREIGN SCHOOL SOCIETY Received: On time
VIC CRAGGS OBE Trustee 18 May 2018
THE BRITISH AND FOREIGN SCHOOL SOCIETY Received: On time
Charlotte Cashman Trustee 17 May 2019
THE BRITISH AND FOREIGN SCHOOL SOCIETY Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY'S, BLETCHLEY Received: On time
PETER MILLER Trustee 01 October 2014
THE BRITISH AND FOREIGN SCHOOL SOCIETY Received: On time
Karen Hughes Trustee 18 May 2018 None on record
Timothy John Andrew Trustee 17 May 2019
CHESHAM STUDENTS' AND APPRENTICES FUND Received: On time
THE BRITISH AND FOREIGN SCHOOL SOCIETY Received: On time
RACHEL JOHNSON'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION Received: On time
PRIORS CHARITY Received: On time
RACHEL JOHNSON'S COAL FUND Received: On time
Janice Miller Trustee 01 July 2020
THE BRITISH AND FOREIGN SCHOOL SOCIETY Received: On time
DAVID BARON Trustee 18 May 2018
THE BRITISH AND FOREIGN SCHOOL SOCIETY Received: On time
JANE CREASY Trustee 18 May 2018
THE BRITISH AND FOREIGN SCHOOL SOCIETY Received: On time
PENN PARISH RECREATION GROUNDS CHARITY Received: On time