Trustees SIR WALTER ST.JOHN'S EDUCATIONAL CHARITY

Charity number: 312690
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

15 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
COLONEL MARTIN STRATTON CBE Trustee 05 May 2020
BATTERSEA CRIME PREVENTION PANEL
Received: On time
Kerry Ann Briscoe Trustee 21 June 2019
None on record
Dave Wagner Trustee 01 December 2016
None on record
Christopher Wellbelove Trustee 19 May 2015
None on record
Councillor Linda Bray Trustee 03 February 2015
SOUTH LONDON RELIEF IN SICKNESS FUND
Received: 2 days late
ROSEMARY ANNE SUMMERFIELD Trustee 02 August 2013
MIKE CAMPBELL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
MICHAEL BATES Trustee 01 February 2013
None on record
THE REVD CANON SIMON BUTLER Trustee 25 January 2012
BATTERSEA UNITED CHARITIES
Received: On time
GOVERNORS OF THE CHARITY FOR RELIEF OF THE POOR WIDOWS AND CHILDREN OF CLERGYMEN (COMMONLY CALLED CLERGY SUPPORT TRUST)
Received: On time
THE FRIENDS OF BATTERSEA PARISH CHURCH
Received: On time
THE ARCHBISHOPS' COUNCIL
Received: On time
THE KATHERINE LOW SETTLEMENT LIMITED
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY'S BATTERSEA
Received: On time
WENDY SPECK Trustee
WANDSWORTH COMMUNITY SAFETY TRUST
Received: On time
BATTERSEA PARK YOUTH CLUB
Received: On time
GODFREY CHARLES ALLEN Trustee
SAFERWORLD
Received: On time
DAPHNE DAYTES Trustee
THE ASSOCIATION OF JAMAICANS (UK) TRUST
Received: On time
SARAH RUTH RACKHAM Trustee
None on record
BARRY ARTHUR FAIRBANK COUNCILLOR Trustee
None on record
COLONEL JULIAN GUY YONGE RADCLIFFE Trustee
None on record
SHELDON ANGUS WILKIE Trustee
None on record