THE WHITECHAPEL EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 312698
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £90.23k £89.20k £90.62k £91.68k £89.30k
Total expenditure £96.58k £87.50k £150.55k £75.53k £114.33k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A