THE AMERICAN SCHOOL IN LONDON EDUCATIONAL TRUST LTD

Charity number: 312738
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £41.31m £44.20m £44.53m £46.27m £46.88m
Total expenditure £38.87m £40.69m £42.11m £44.92m £44.88m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £583.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £6.26m £6.56m £4.98m £4.37m £3.24m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £290.00k £0 £318.00k
Income - Charitable activities £34.60m £37.17m £38.90m £41.09m £42.03m
Income - Endowments £632.00k £904.00k £335.00k £1.07m £1.57m
Income - Investment £453.00k £394.00k £355.00k £418.00k £706.00k
Income - Other £0 £78.00k £0 £380.00k £583.00k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £37.84m £39.48m £40.57m £43.20m £43.31m
Expenditure - Raising funds £574.00k £591.00k £612.00k £613.00k £1.57m
Expenditure - Governance £128.00k £177.00k £108.00k £105.00k £102.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £135.00k £138.00k £131.00k
Expenditure - Other £455.00k £628.00k £931.00k £1.11m £0