ROYAL ACADEMY OF DANCE

Charity number: 312826
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £19.91m £22.30m £22.45m £23.93m £16.95m
Total expenditure £19.67m £21.83m £22.64m £23.92m £19.94m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £530.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £138.00k £52.00k £30.00k £48.00k £382.00k
Income - Other trading activities £1.15m £1.37m £1.34m £1.34m £1.17m
Income - Charitable activities £18.52m £20.73m £20.95m £22.22m £14.22m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £40.00k £44.00k £30.00k £32.00k £28.00k
Income - Other £66.00k £114.00k £106.00k £295.00k £1.15m
Income - Legacies £50.00k £0 £30.00k £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £18.23m £20.39m £20.91m £22.23m £17.95m
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.14m £1.33m £1.45m £1.34m £1.46m
Expenditure - Governance £633.00k £454.00k £438.00k £401.00k £511.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £305.00k £108.00k £273.00k £351.00k £527.00k