Financial history THE ROYAL COLLEGE OF ORGANISTS

Charity number: 312847
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022
Total gross income £646.27k £489.53k £553.77k £670.97k £426.15k
Total expenditure £540.31k £549.59k £563.90k £501.13k £554.78k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £257.08k N/A £157.22k £325.35k N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A £0 £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities £289.46k N/A £289.93k £249.97k N/A
Income - Endowments £2.29k N/A £1.22k £0 N/A
Income - Investment £102.02k N/A £107.83k £95.65k N/A
Income - Other £0 N/A £0 £0 N/A
Income - Legacies £206.55k N/A £111.81k £218.32k N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £480.18k N/A £513.99k £452.56k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £60.13k N/A £49.91k £48.56k N/A
Expenditure - Governance £0 N/A £7.50k £12.19k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £18.46k N/A £13.55k £16.76k N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A £0 £0 N/A