Governing document THE LONDON DIOCESAN BOARD FOR SCHOOLS

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION DATED 28TH APRIL 1924 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS PASSED 15TH JULY 1974, 10TH MAY 1982, 10TH MAY 1993 AND 13TH DECEMBER 2006.
Charitable objects
1. TO PROMOTE OR ASSIST IN THE PROMOTION OF EDUCATION IN THE DIOCESE, BEING EDUCATION WHICH IS CONSISTENT WITH THE FAITH AND PRACTICE OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND. 2. TO PROMOTE, OR ASSIST IN THE PROMOTION OF RELIGIOUS EDUCATION AND RELIGIOUS WORSHIP IN SCHOOLS IN THE DIOCESE.
Area of benefit
DIOCESE OF LONDON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.