Dogfen lywodraethu The Leathercraft Trust
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 03/12/1951 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13/04/2011 AS AMENDED ON 12 AUG 2020 AS AMENDED ON 25 JAN 2024 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23 NOV 2023 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 26 JAN 2024
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN LEATHERCRAFT, ITS HISTORY, INDUSTRY, CULTURE, APPLICATIONS AND CONTINUING CRAFTSMANSHIP BY: 4.1 PROMOTING AND SUPPORTING THE CARE, PRESERVATION, ENHANCEMENT AND DISPLAY OF COLLECTIONS OF ACADEMIC, CULTURAL OR HISTORICAL VALUE; AND 4.2 MAINTAINING OR SUPPORTING THE MAINTENANCE OF A LIBRARY, LEATHERCRAFT COLLECTION OR RESOURCE CENTRE.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.