THE BRITISH ASSOCIATION FOR EARLY CHILDHOOD EDUCATION

Charity number: 313082
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 02 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 02 December 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 09 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 09 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 27 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 27 November 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 25 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 25 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 25 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 25 October 2017 On time Download