THE DUCHESS OF LEEDS FOUNDATION FOR BOYS AND GIRLS

Charity number: 313103
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 16 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 16 April 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 11 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 11 April 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 03 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 10 April 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 10 April 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 23 March 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 23 March 2016 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)