Financial history THE BRITISH INSTITUTION FUND

Charity number: 313248
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £7.34k £7.45k £7.60k £7.75k £7.91k
Total expenditure £8.07k £8.87k £8.45k £72 £8.07k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A