Dogfen lywodraethu ROYAL TELEVISION SOCIETY
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION DATED 12 JULY 1930 AS ALTERED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 24 APRIL 1964, 9 DECEMBER 1966, 18 JANUARY 1968 , 12 FEBRUARY 1981,19 OCTOBER 1994, 4TH APRIL 1995, 23 MAY 2007 AND 27 MAY 2009. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24 MAY 2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24 MAY 2016 as amended on 30 Jun 2020
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF PUBLIC EDUCATION IN THE PRACTICE, TECHNOLOGY, ART AND SCIENCE OF TELEVISION AND ALLIED FIELDS (B) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ARTS AND CULTURE, IN PARTICULAR BY PROMOTING AND ENCOURAGING THE ACHIEVEMENT OF HIGH STANDARDS OF CREATIVITY IN TELEVISION AND ALLIED FIELDS
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.