Financial history BOOK AID INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 313869
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £9.96m £19.42m £2.28m £14.81m £12.57m
Total expenditure £12.00m £18.08m £2.20m £12.97m £15.59m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £9.96m £2.02m £2.25m £1.89m £2.54m
Income - Other trading activities £2.43k £5.39k £11.14k £1.76k £5
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £8.30k £59.42k £11.96k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £3.15k £7.66k £10.27k £8.55k £5.32k
Income - Other £0 £17.39m £1.62k £12.85m £10.01m
Income - Legacies £131.79k £158.60k £275.04k £27.23k £123.01k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £11.43m £1.51m £1.62m £1.37m £1.71m
Expenditure - Raising funds £565.71k £523.31k £588.96k £534.72k £599.44k
Expenditure - Governance £9.83k £12.24k £15.48k £10.81k £14.74k
Expenditure - Grants institution £164.38k £225.11k £284.50k £193.08k £410.12k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £16.05m £0 £11.07m £13.28m