Trustees ASSOCIATION OF COMMONWEALTH UNIVERSITIES
Charity number: 314137
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Cheryl de la Rey | Chair | 19 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Professor Sibongile Muthwa | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Kabiru Aderemi Adeyemo | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Hina Tayyaba Khalil | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Simone Buitendijk | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Sir Hilary McDonald Beckles | Trustee | 01 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Wendy Thomson CBE | Trustee | 01 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Bevil Milton Glover AO | Trustee | 01 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Abiodun Humphrey Adebayo | Trustee | 01 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Senior Professor Sudantha Liyanage | Trustee | 01 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Feridun Hamdullahpur | Trustee | 29 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor Davinder Pal Singh Ahluwalia | Trustee | 19 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Professor Barnabas Nawangwe | Trustee | 19 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Professor Amanda J Broderick | Trustee | 15 July 2019 |
|
|||||
Dr Rhonda L Lenton | Trustee | 15 July 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.