SACRED HEART SCHOOL BEECHWOOD TRUST LTD

Charity number: 325104
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 COVID filing extension granted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 COVID filing extension granted
Annual return 31 August 2018 07 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 07 March 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 20 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 20 March 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 20 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

05 May 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2015 09 June 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2015 09 June 2016 On time Download