SACRED HEART SCHOOL BEECHWOOD TRUST LTD

Charity number: 325104
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2014 31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018
Total gross income £4.31m £5.20m £5.13m £5.22m £7.21m
Total expenditure £4.43m £4.97m £5.10m £5.23m £5.78m
Income from government contracts N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £28.05k £22.72k £41.59k £40.21k £11.00k
Income - Other trading activities £40.14k £4.58k £26.92k £4.75k £7.37k
Income - Charitable activities £4.06m £5.17m £4.93m £4.92m £5.16m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £28 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £186.31k £0 £134.96k £262.03k £2.03m
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £4.38m £4.92m £5.10m £5.19m £5.76m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £2.47k £40.05k £19.63k
Expenditure - Governance £14.53k £16.02k £17.89k £19.54k £23.89k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0