Financial history WARRINGTON EMMAUS FELLOWSHIP TRUST

Charity number: 326034
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £88.97k £84.90k £88.13k £85.79k £75.21k
Total expenditure £78.37k £81.10k £103.69k £77.79k £66.33k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A