Financial history THE TOM LETHABY MEMORIAL TRUST

Charity number: 326047
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 15/02/2018 15/02/2019 15/02/2020 15/02/2021 15/02/2022
Total gross income £14.05k £14.79k £12.77k £5.21k £6.05k
Total expenditure £4.63k £21.45k £7.34k £13.38k £8.13k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A