SOCIETY OF CARTOGRAPHERS

Charity number: 326285
Charity reporting is overdue by 302 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 302 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 302 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 13 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 29 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 02 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 13 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required