SOCIETY OF CARTOGRAPHERS

Charity number: 326285
Charity reporting is overdue by 305 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019
Total gross income £4.68k £5.41k £5.76k £3.39k £4.35k
Total expenditure £18.30k £8.37k £3.61k £3.03k £4.72k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A