COMMON GROUND

Charity number: 326335
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £9.96k £55.83k £171.58k £58.02k £35.31k
Total expenditure £15.38k £55.01k £166.00k £61.67k £34.76k
Income from government contracts N/A £2.24k £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A