THE CHARITABLE TRUST OF THE ASSOCIATION OF THE PUPILS OF ROSEMARY COBHAM C S B

Charity number: 326448
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 18 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 21 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 04 November 2019 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 04 November 2019 4 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 11 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 26 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required