THE CHARITABLE TRUST OF THE ASSOCIATION OF THE PUPILS OF ROSEMARY COBHAM C S B

Charity number: 326448
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £1.90k £1.52k £252.66k £16.84k £1.44k
Total expenditure £15.96k £11.27k £14.91k £17.63k £5.30k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A