CHARITY PROJECTS

Charity number: 326568
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £92.22m £104.72m £65.14m £85.99m £78.03m
Total expenditure £127.80m £98.56m £65.68m £98.93m £105.55m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.42m £11.29m £11.60m £9.33m £13.89m
Income - Donations and legacies £79.57m £86.95m £56.25m £70.96m £70.90m
Income - Other trading activities £8.16m £13.64m £5.64m £11.68m £5.17m
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £4.49m £4.13m £3.25m £3.35m £1.95m
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £253.00k £0 £0 £36.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £109.81m £81.49m £48.07m £83.79m £89.47m
Expenditure - Raising funds £18.00m £17.07m £17.61m £15.15m £16.08m
Expenditure - Governance £110.00k £129.00k £120.00k £180.00k £184.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £100.91m £74.39m £37.51m £74.97m £79.94m
Expenditure - Investment management £866.00k £814.00k £790.00k £417.00k £645.00k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0