CHARITY PROJECTS

Charity number: 326568
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
FIONA CAMPBELL Trustee 11 September 2020 None on record
Eric Salama Chair 01 July 2020 None on record
Jacqueline Onalo Trustee 27 February 2019
COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT INITIATIVES Received: On time
Gautam Raju Trustee 27 February 2019 None on record
Dr Sue Black Trustee 16 May 2018 None on record
Jenny Hodgson Trustee 27 February 2019 None on record
Charlotte Moar Trustee 27 February 2019 None on record
SAUL CHARLES KLEIN Trustee 27 May 2015 None on record
RUPERT OLIVER HENRY MORLEY Trustee 28 November 2018 None on record
Tom Shropshire Trustee 28 March 2018 None on record
TESSY OJO Trustee 16 May 2018
CITY PRAISE CENTRE Received: On time
CITY PRAISE CENTRE CIO Received: On time
GENERATION CHANGE Overdue by 378 days
Matt Hyde Trustee 27 February 2019 None on record