Able Child Africa

Charity number: 326859
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 02 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 02 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 01 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 01 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 24 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 24 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 23 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 23 November 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 13 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 13 December 2016 On time Download