Able Child Africa

Charity number: 326859
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £493.37k £617.81k £690.22k £793.50k £987.33k
Total expenditure £469.10k £611.22k £593.64k £773.47k £774.94k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £69.09k £5.00k £0 £163.50k £158.20k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £202.80k £262.14k £200.41k £410.65k
Income - Other trading activities N/A £3.23k £2.45k £7.40k £3.36k
Income - Charitable activities N/A £411.36k £425.53k £585.48k £573.01k
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £428 £98 £211 £321
Income - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £29.42k £0 £183.50k
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £500.23k £521.68k £681.64k £685.68k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £110.99k £71.96k £91.83k £89.26k
Expenditure - Governance N/A £0 £6.47k £8.09k £6.52k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £300.77k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0